OK HCR1011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR1011
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; oil and gas industry.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; oil and gas industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-18 | House | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2021-05-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin) |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered |
2021-05-17 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-05-17 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2021-05-17 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HCR1011 (Carry Over) 2021-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State