OK HB4153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driving under the influence; creating the Driving Under the Influence Reform Act of 2024; effective date.
Title
Driving under the influence; creating the Driving Under the Influence Reform Act of 2024; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Schreiber |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |