OK HB4072 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; aerospace industry; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; aerospace industry; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Nick Archer [R] |
Rep. Arturo Alonso-Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2024 |
2024-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 4 |
2024-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer |
2024-02-20 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2024-02-13 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |