OK HB4064 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State fiscal affairs; creating the OK Invest Advisory Commission; designating membership; prescribing member qualifications; prohibiting certain interest; authorizing promulgation of rules; creating the OK Invest Fund; providing sources of funds; effective date.
Title
State fiscal affairs; creating the OK Invest Advisory Commission; designating membership; prescribing member qualifications; prohibiting certain interest; authorizing promulgation of rules; creating the OK Invest Fund; providing sources of funds; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 10 |
2024-02-26 | House | General Order |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |