OK HB4064 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State government; creating the State Government Health Care Administrative Reform and Reorganization Act of 2020; consolidating the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; creating the State Government Health Care Administrative Reform and Reorganization Act of 2020; consolidating the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 28
2020-03-11HouseEmergency removed
2020-03-11HouseTitle stricken
2020-03-11HouseAmended
2020-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2020-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-03-02HouseEmergency added
2020-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback