OK HB4038 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; manufacturing employer and employee; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; manufacturing employer and employee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 35 |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Townley |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |