OK HB4028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Transportation; directing the promulgation of rules and procedures to conduct certain traffic study; directing the modification of certain plan; effective date.
Title
Department of Transportation; directing the promulgation of rules and procedures to conduct certain traffic study; directing the modification of certain plan; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R] |
Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Ronny Johns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Cornwell, CrosswhiteHader |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johns |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |