OK HB4018 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Telecommunications; enacting the Oklahoma Rural Broadband Expansion Act; creating the Rural Broadband Expansion Council; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications; enacting the Oklahoma Rural Broadband Expansion Act; creating the Rural Broadband Expansion Council; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITH EMERGENCY (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2020-05-22SenateMeasure returned to House
2020-05-22SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2020-05-22HouseTo Senate
2020-05-22HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
2020-05-22HouseVetoed 05/19/2020
2020-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-12HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-12SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-12SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2020-05-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from Business and Commerce committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2020-03-17Senatecoauthored by Townley
2020-03-17Senatecoauthored by Strom
2020-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
2020-03-11HouseAmended
2020-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2020-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-25HouseEmergency added
2020-02-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
2020-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback