OK HB3999 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; identity theft; authorizing court to limit or prohibit Internet and computer access; monitoring software; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; identity theft; authorizing court to limit or prohibit Internet and computer access; monitoring software; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |