OK HB3884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; extending creation of Commission on County Government Personnel Education and Training; effective date; emergency.
Title
Counties and county officers; extending creation of Commission on County Government Personnel Education and Training; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] |
Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, McDugle |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles |
2020-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |