OK HB3867 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; nonresident owners; charges; county elections; procedures; distribution of funds; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; nonresident owners; charges; county elections; procedures; distribution of funds; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |