OK HB3823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; qualifying doctors; rural areas; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; qualifying doctors; rural areas; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles |
2020-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 |
2020-02-26 | House | Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Sneed, Luttrell, Cornwell, Roe, Roberts (Sean) |
2020-02-26 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Mize |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |