OK HB3821 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster relief; Office of Emergency Management; Stormwater Management Predictive Analytic Solution; effective date.
Title
Disaster relief; Office of Emergency Management; Stormwater Management Predictive Analytic Solution; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] | Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) May |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |