OK HB3813 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; law enforcement powers of certain employees of the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; law enforcement powers of certain employees of the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-23 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Stinson |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |