OK HB3809 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; annual bonuses for certain public school employees; Oklahoma School Psychologist, Speech-Language Pathologist, and Audiologist National Certification Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; annual bonuses for certain public school employees; Oklahoma School Psychologist, Speech-Language Pathologist, and Audiologist National Certification Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |