OK HB3791 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy; interchangeable biological products; effective date.
Title
Pharmacy; interchangeable biological products; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Virgin |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Marti |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |