OK HB3784 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; adding certain criminal offenses to list of crimes; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; adding certain criminal offenses to list of crimes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative George |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |