OK HB3574 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Kratom Consumer Protection Act; definitions; restrictions on the preparation, distribution, or sale of certain kratom products; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Kratom Consumer Protection Act; definitions; restrictions on the preparation, distribution, or sale of certain kratom products; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. Dana Prieto [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Prieto (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Pae |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |