OK HB3562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; Court of Civil Appeals; modifying name and authority; requiring all civil appeals be assigned to Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals; judges; effective date.
Title
Courts; Court of Civil Appeals; modifying name and authority; requiring all civil appeals be assigned to Oklahoma Court of Civil Appeals; judges; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 15 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 67 |
2020-05-15 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2020-05-14 | House | SA's received |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-05-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Pugh |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 33 |
2020-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |