OK HB3474 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child abuse; modifying definition of child abuse; effective date.
Title
Child abuse; modifying definition of child abuse; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Barrington, Brinkley, Griffin, Garrison, Ivester |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-13 | House | Considered |
2014-03-12 | House | Laid over |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |