OK HB3473 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; child death or near death reports; providing statements expressing sympathy by DHS are inadmissible; effective date.
Title
Children; child death or near death reports; providing statements expressing sympathy by DHS are inadmissible; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: DHS THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: DHS THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Sykes, Brinkley, Griffin, Garrison, Ivester |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Nollan |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |