OK HB3469 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; autopsies; deceased child; exceptions; conditions; consent; medical examiner; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; autopsies; deceased child; exceptions; conditions; consent; medical examiner; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |