OK HB3462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Live game; creating the Chronic Wasting Disease Genetic Improvement Act; effective date.
Title
Live game; creating the Chronic Wasting Disease Genetic Improvement Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Archer [R] | Sen. Grant Green [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Anthony Moore [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2024 |
2024-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-30 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer |
2024-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2024-02-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2024-02-28 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Archer |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |