OK HB3452 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; requiring the overtaking and passing another vehicle to be performed expeditiously; setting time limit to complete act; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; requiring the overtaking and passing another vehicle to be performed expeditiously; setting time limit to complete act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23 |
2024-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |