OK HB3449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trusts; court modification or termination of trusts; effective date.
Title
Trusts; court modification or termination of trusts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 36 |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 16 |
2022-03-10 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative ODonnell |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 33 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |