OK HB3444 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting managed care entity from imposing requirements relating to vaccination protocol; effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting managed care entity from imposing requirements relating to vaccination protocol; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |