OK HB3408 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; child abuse; definition; term; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; child abuse; definition; term; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4 |
2022-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-21 | House | Amended |
2022-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2022-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |