OK HB3407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Act; modifying definition of excavate; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Act; modifying definition of excavate; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 11 |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Allen, Fields, David, Pederson, Rader, Matthews, Floyd |
2018-04-18 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Utilities |
2018-04-12 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 24 |
2018-03-13 | House | Amended |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Watson |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |