OK HB3405 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water; modifying definitions relating to groundwater; effective date.
Title
Water; modifying definitions relating to groundwater; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 9 |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-05-01 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 27 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Watson |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |