OK HB3387 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - 3 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - 3 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; requiring Insurance Commissioner to provide certain report; relating to uninsured motorist coverage; specifying certain vehicles shall not be required to have certain coverage; prohibiting the imposition of accident response fees in certain emergencies. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; requiring Insurance Commissioner to provide certain report; relating to uninsured motorist coverage; specifying certain vehicles shall not be required to have certain coverage; prohibiting the imposition of accident response fees in certain emergencies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | 3 CCR read | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-05-28 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | 3 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-28 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | SCs changed Burrage to Rice | |
2010-05-19 | SCs changed Marlatt, Jolley, Aldridge, Crain, Adelson, Burrage to Marlatt, Coffee, Burrage | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-11 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-06 | Title restored | |
2010-05-06 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Terrill, Blackwell, Jackson, Morrissette, Nations, Christian, Sanders, Sullivan, Morgan | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Jolley, Aldridge, Crain, Adelson, Burrage | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | coauthored by Adelson | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-22 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 307 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 3636 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6056 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 10 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text |