OK HB3366 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; creating the Marvin Williams and Robbie Chase Whitebird County Sheriff Assistance Act. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; creating the Marvin Williams and Robbie Chase Whitebird County Sheriff Assistance Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Jett | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |