OK HB3338 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Fire Marshal; prohibiting conflict of interest; removing limit on State Fire Marshal Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Title
State Fire Marshal; prohibiting conflict of interest; removing limit on State Fire Marshal Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Title restored | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Christian, Terrill, McCullough, Proctor, Smithson | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-22 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Christian | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 324 | 20b | New Code | See Bill Text |