OK HB3323 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Poor persons; creating Kelley's Law; requiring confidentiality form; specifying content and requiring signature. Effective date.
Title
Poor persons; creating Kelley's Law; requiring confidentiality form; specifying content and requiring signature. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor 04/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Eason McIntyre | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Pittman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |