OK HB3287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Laid over on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Laid over on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics; prohibiting use of certain state property for personal political advocacy; providing penalties; effective date.
Title
Ethics; prohibiting use of certain state property for personal political advocacy; providing penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Laid over on Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |