OK HB3284 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Vetoed 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Vetoed 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; State Governmental Technology Applications Review Board; requiring Board to approve rates set or changed; effective date.
Title
Public finance; State Governmental Technology Applications Review Board; requiring Board to approve rates set or changed; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Vetoed 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |