OK HB3278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; qualification; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; qualification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-02 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 7 |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | Title restored |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, David, Thompson, Smalley, Leewright, Sparks, Floyd |
2018-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |