OK HB3259 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to alternative placement teaching certificate; modifying alternative placement program requirements. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to alternative placement teaching certificate; modifying alternative placement program requirements. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 4 | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Blackwell | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 12; Ayes: 55 Nays: 36 | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-17 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Blackwell | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |