OK HB3240 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the Aaron Gillming Act; requiring persons convicted of driving under the influence to participate in certain evaluation and assessment program. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the Aaron Gillming Act; requiring persons convicted of driving under the influence to participate in certain evaluation and assessment program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |