OK HB3233 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax; tourism gross receipts tax; use tax; apportionments; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax; tourism gross receipts tax; use tax; apportionments; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Nick Archer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |