OK HB3228 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Vetoed 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marijuana; Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; licenses; renewal; waste disposal; testing; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; licenses; renewal; waste disposal; testing; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseVetoed 05/21/2020
2020-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 11
2020-05-15HouseSA's read, adopted
2020-05-15HouseSA's received
2020-05-15SenateEngrossed to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-05-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2020-05-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-05-14SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-14SenateWithdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2020-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
2020-03-11HouseAmended
2020-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2020-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3228&Session=2000
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB3228%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3228%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB3228%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB3228%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3228%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB3228%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3228_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3228_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback