OK HB3219 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; authorizing expenditures from the Oklahoma Court Information System Revolving Fund; emergency.
Title
Courts; authorizing expenditures from the Oklahoma Court Information System Revolving Fund; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2016-05-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9 |
2016-05-23 | House | JCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | House | General Order |
2016-05-20 | House | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-20 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2016-05-19 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2016-05-19 | House | Authored by Representative Sears, Casey |
2016-05-19 | House | First Reading |