OK HB3218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 69-8)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 69-8)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; modifying school testing requirements; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying school testing requirements; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brown |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Jolley; authored by Bingman |
2016-05-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-23 | House | JCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Smalley, Ford, Sparks, Newberry, Silk, Fry, Dossett, Brooks, Halligan, Crain, Simpson, Floyd, Sharp, Standridge, Paddack, Thompson, Jech, Matthews, Loveless, Quinn, Boggs, Pittman, Bice, Holt, Allen, Barrington |
2016-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson, Bennett, Walker, Ownbey, Newell, Rogers, Faught, Pfeiffer, Murdock, Jordan, Cockroft, Henke, Kannady, Wallace, Wright, Mulready, Banz, Leewright, Nollan, Coody (Ann), Kirby, Biggs, Cleveland, Christian, Hall, Dunlap, Caldwell, Roberts (Dustin), ODonnell, McCullough, Moore, Condit, Wood, Montgomery, Roberts (Sean), McBride, Russ, Denney, Thomsen, Billy, Sears |
2016-05-23 | House | Remove Representative Sears as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hickman |
2016-05-23 | House | General Order |
2016-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Strohm, Brumbaugh, Martin, Derby, Osborn |
2016-05-20 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-18 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2016-05-18 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2016-05-18 | House | Authored by Representative Sears, Casey |
2016-05-18 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 506 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 507 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508B | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 515 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 521 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 522 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 523 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 525 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 526 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 545 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |