OK HB3214 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children; children detained in adult facilities; incarceration; hearing; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; children detained in adult facilities; incarceration; hearing; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-02-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-02-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
2020-02-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ranson
2020-02-24HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2020-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson
2020-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback