OK HB3167 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; maximum speed limits; Department of Transportation; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; maximum speed limits; Department of Transportation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2016 |
2016-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 15 |
2016-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Ritze |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 8 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright |
2016-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |