OK HB3160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Eminent domain; relating to street improvements; requiring certain property owners to concur before an area is assessed. Emergency.
Title
Eminent domain; relating to street improvements; requiring certain property owners to concur before an area is assessed. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Title restored | |
2010-05-11 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | SCs added Ballenger | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Osborn, Armes, DeWitt, Holland, Scott, Hilliard, Fields, Enns | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Reynolds, Schulz, Sykes, Ivester | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Withdrawn from Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Osborn | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 36 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 38 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 40 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 854 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 1094 | New Code | See Bill Text |