OK HB3159 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed 06/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed 06/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing time limitation for placing persons on parole docket; modifying eligibility requirements for accumulating earned credits; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing time limitation for placing persons on parole docket; modifying eligibility requirements for accumulating earned credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed 06/10/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Cleveland |
2016-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |