OK HB3155 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Officers; providing additional exemption from Open Records Act relating to information contained in the files of the Chief Medical Examiner and autopsy reports; requiring release of prepared report. Emergency.
Title
Officers; providing additional exemption from Open Records Act relating to information contained in the files of the Chief Medical Examiner and autopsy reports; requiring release of prepared report. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: C (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Laid over | |
2010-05-17 | Considered | |
2010-05-11 | Title restored | |
2010-05-11 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Osborn, Duncan, Jordan, McCullough, Kouplen, Rousselot, Thomsen | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Jolley, Coffee, Lamb, Burrage | |
2010-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-19 | SA's received | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Osborn | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |