OK HB3131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; state vehicles; modifying requirements for state vehicles; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; state vehicles; modifying requirements for state vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 13 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Boggs; authored by Senator Murdock |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | Remove Representative Murdock as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |