OK HB3128 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; allowing the assignment of death benefits of certain entities authorized to provide funeral services. Effective date.
Title
State government; allowing the assignment of death benefits of certain entities authorized to provide funeral services. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Neil Brannon [D] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Corey Holland [R] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Glen Smithson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: R (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: R (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor 04/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-04 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Smithson, Brannon, Roan, Holland, McAffrey | |
2010-03-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |