OK HB3126 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

9-1-1 emergency services; creating the 9-1-1 Management Authority Act; effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

9-1-1 emergency services; creating the 9-1-1 Management Authority Act; effective dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24HouseApproved by Governor 05/24/2016
2016-05-20HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-19HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-19SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
2016-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2016-05-18SenateCCR read
2016-05-18HouseTo Senate
2016-05-18HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16
2016-05-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
2016-05-18HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-16HouseTitle restored
2016-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2016-04-27SenateConference granted, SCs named Smalley, Mazzei, Marlatt, Fields, Griffin, Pittman, Floyd
2016-04-25HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2016-04-14HouseSA's received
2016-04-14SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2016-04-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-04-05SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2016-03-31SenateReferred to Finance
2016-03-31SenateTitle stricken
2016-03-31SenateReported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
2016-03-30Senatecoauthored by Paddack
2016-03-22Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2016-03-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Finance Committee
2016-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-02-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-02-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 34
2016-02-24HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-11HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2016-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Cockroft
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6328431Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6328432Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3126&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB3126%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB3126%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3126%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB3126%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB3126%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB3126%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3126%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB3126%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB3126%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB3126_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB3126_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback